THE DOXA PROJECT LIMITED

Charity number: 1149836
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/01/2016 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020
Total gross income £68.11k £40.73k £38.42k £61.94k £60.37k
Total expenditure £83.09k £31.23k £35.15k £44.56k £44.01k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A