ABERGARWED WELFARE FUND

Charity number: 503181
Charity reporting is overdue by 550 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £2.00k
Total expenditure £0 £243 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A