ORLANDO ROGERS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1149603
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 04 September 2020 02 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 04 September 2019 26 March 2021 265 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 04 September 2018 04 March 2020 244 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 04 September 2017 07 September 2018 65 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 04 September 2016 03 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 September 2016 Not Required