ORLANDO ROGERS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1149603
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 04/09/2016 04/09/2017 04/09/2018 04/09/2019 04/09/2020
Total gross income £60 £24 £1.57k £16.00k £0
Total expenditure £246 £1.72k £807 £791 £162
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A