THE ZOOLOGICAL SOCIETY OF EAST ANGLIA LIMITED

Charity number: 1150158
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £5.77m £6.06m £5.94m £6.03m £6.42m
Total expenditure £5.32m £5.69m £5.92m £6.07m £6.01m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £774.52k £752.27k £711.96k £729.17k £653.13k
Income - Other trading activities £1.57m £1.63m £1.60m £1.62m £1.71m
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £4.06m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £12.50k £748 £26 £188 £0
Income - Other £3.42m £3.68m £3.62m £3.68m £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.06m £4.43m £4.58m £4.72m £4.46m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £1.25m £1.34m £1.35m £1.55m
Expenditure - Governance £40.00k £40.00k £0 £18.56k £11.79k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0