THE ZOOLOGICAL SOCIETY OF EAST ANGLIA LIMITED

Charity number: 1150158
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gerard Smith Trustee 27 August 2014 None on record
JONATHAN JAMES GOODSON Trustee 09 January 2018 None on record
Dr ANDREW HASSAN Trustee 16 November 2017 None on record
Jonathan Charles Pearson Trustee 23 October 2012
THE FRIENDS OF THETFORD DAD'S ARMY MUSEUM Received: On time
OPEN ROAD WEST NORFOLK TRUST Received: On time
Caroline Bixby Trustee 31 October 2019 None on record
DR FREDERIC EDOUARD BARRELET Trustee 27 August 2014
THE SUFFOLK HORSE SOCIETY Received: On time