SUPPORTING WOUNDED VETERANS LTD.

Charity number: 1149727
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £1.28m £1.11m £943.24k £715.69k £1.16m
Total expenditure £855.96k £1.03m £739.44k £682.41k £691.68k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £392.00k £463.71k £408.55k N/A £528.61k
Income - Donations and legacies £785.05k £582.35k £505.04k £553.22k £570.63k
Income - Other trading activities £68.47k £15.84k £29.65k £53.12k £64.18k
Income - Charitable activities £423.00k £508.74k £408.55k £109.35k £528.61k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £664.02k £931.99k £626.56k £621.61k £579.47k
Expenditure - Raising funds £53.80k £56.53k £38.10k £34.93k £73.20k
Expenditure - Governance £22.97k £23.16k £0 £22.16k £26.18k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £138.14k £45.40k £74.78k £25.86k £39.01k