Accounts and annual returns LITTLE WEIGHTON PLAYING FIELDS ASSOCIATION TRUST

Charity number: 503231
Charity reporting is overdue by 1614 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 11 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 153 days
Accounts and TAR 11 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 153 days
Annual return 11 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 518 days
Accounts and TAR 11 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 518 days
Annual return 11 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 883 days
Accounts and TAR 11 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 883 days
Annual return 11 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1248 days
Accounts and TAR 11 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1248 days
Annual return 11 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1614 days
Accounts and TAR 11 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1614 days