Financial history LITTLE WEIGHTON PLAYING FIELDS ASSOCIATION TRUST

Charity number: 503231
Charity reporting is overdue by 1616 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 11/03/2009 11/03/2010 11/03/2011 18/07/2012 11/03/2013
Total gross income £5.81k £8.48k £10.58k £3.38k £0
Total expenditure £6.26k £6.82k £10.93k £14.55k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A