CATS IN CRISIS LINCOLN

Charity number: 1150145
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £45.93k £59.00k £44.43k £20.35k £39.63k
Total expenditure £37.04k £41.00k £45.20k £45.70k £27.37k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A