Accounts and annual returns BTWENTYSEVEN FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1150431
Charity reporting is overdue by 951 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2021 Overdue Overdue by 221 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Overdue Overdue by 221 days
Annual return 30 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 586 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 586 days
Annual return 30 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 951 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 951 days
Annual return 30 April 2018 03 June 2019 95 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2017 22 May 2018 83 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not Required