THE DEVELOP AFRICA TRUST

Charity number: 1149842
Charity reporting is overdue by 166 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 10/10/2015 10/10/2016 10/10/2017 10/10/2018 10/10/2019
Total gross income £6.98k £6.98k £6.45k £8.38k £5.70k
Total expenditure £6.98k £6.98k £6.45k £8.38k £5.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A