NIGHT CHURCH HASTINGS

Charity number: 1150033
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 25 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 21 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2018 26 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2017 24 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2016 20 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 Not Required