BLACKBURN FOODBANK

Charity number: 1151310
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020
Total gross income £61.30k £68.71k £112.41k £74.18k £157.01k
Total expenditure £66.00k £67.97k £70.96k £77.49k £99.45k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £20.00k £20.00k £20.00k £30.00k £25.00k