WILLIAM ROWAN HAMILTON TRUST

Charity number: 1150524
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 31 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 31 August 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2019 15 September 2020 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 15 September 2020 15 days late Download
Annual return 31 October 2018 28 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 28 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2017 28 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 28 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2016 21 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 21 August 2017 On time Download