WILLIAM ROWAN HAMILTON TRUST

Charity number: 1150524
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £1.07m £850.23k £708.66k £596.59k £658.44k
Total expenditure £961.33k £898.28k £1.01m £903.98k £642.11k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £663.03k £478.96k £404.35k £320.39k £392.84k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £373.75k £321.98k £257.77k £237.73k £237.21k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £31.36k £49.02k £46.43k £38.33k £28.39k
Income - Other £218 £280 £120 £130 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £950.89k £883.59k £1.00m £895.09k £632.05k
Expenditure - Raising funds £10.45k £14.69k £10.59k £8.89k £10.06k
Expenditure - Governance £4.02k £7.00k £10.26k £10.52k £4.11k
Expenditure - Grants institution £260.67k £194.60k £79.49k £77.45k £70.08k
Expenditure - Investment management £10.45k £14.69k £10.59k £8.89k £10.06k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0