NEWCASTLE STAFFS FOODBANK

Charity number: 1150816
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
30/08/2016 30/08/2017 30/08/2018 30/08/2019 30/08/2020
Total gross income £19.86k £14.08k £21.90k £23.35k £87.39k
Total expenditure £15.59k £7.36k £11.74k £21.75k £27.45k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £2.00k N/A £11.33k