Financial history NIWE EATING DISTRESS SERVICE TRADING AS EATING DISTRESS NORTH EAST

Charity number: 1150416
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £154.21k £182.24k £121.13k £191.80k £218.53k
Total expenditure £135.67k £142.15k £125.82k £147.66k £149.54k
Income from government contracts £20.12k N/A £22.73k £29.91k N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A