CRANSLEY HOSPICE TRUST

Charity number: 1151018
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Deirdre Mukhtar Trustee 26 June 2019 None on record
Andrew Attfield Trustee 17 May 2017 None on record
Maxine Ann Estop - Green Trustee 24 July 2019 None on record
Christopher Turner Trustee 23 August 2017
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER AND ST PAUL, KETTERING Received: On time
Daniel Freeland Trustee 17 May 2017 None on record
Paul Andrew Humphrey Chair 22 April 2020 None on record
REV DR JOHN SIMON SMITH Trustee 09 February 2013 None on record