Accounts and annual returns 1ST CATTERICK (ST ANNES ) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 503276
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 29 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 16 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 16 July 2019 166 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 24 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required