Financial history 1ST CATTERICK (ST ANNES ) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 503276
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £7.62k £5.93k £6.57k £5.61k £10.78k
Total expenditure £4.85k £4.13k £4.89k £5.52k £4.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £10.00k