DIGSWELL ARTS TRUST

Charity number: 1150915
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £40.45k £43.58k £33.88k £38.94k £32.44k
Total expenditure £38.50k £34.81k £35.78k £40.94k £37.01k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A