Trustees DIGSWELL ARTS TRUST
Charity number: 1150915
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael John Shaw | Chair | 23 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD LEWIN BENSTED | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Faye Munroe | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kailas Ananda Sunya Elmer | Trustee | 14 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Allistair Julian Covell | Trustee | 20 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anton Psak | Trustee | 23 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
STEVE ROGERS | Trustee | 23 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
HOWARD REGINALD CROPP FCA | Trustee | 23 November 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.