Financial history FUSION HOUSING KIRKLEES LTD

Charity number: 1151483
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £3.50m £3.03m £3.27m £4.32m £4.97m
Total expenditure £3.49m £3.04m £3.26m £4.27m £4.87m
Income from government contracts £2.54m £1.79m £1.40m £703.35k £305.66k
Income from government grants £626.43k £374.41k £316.61k £144.17k £277.78k
Income - Donations and legacies £5.60k £49.75k £5.16k £13.91k £15.63k
Income - Other trading activities £338.67k £591.19k £1.41m £0 £2.98m
Income - Charitable activities £3.16m £2.39m £1.85m £1.95m £1.97m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £102 £10 £99 £177 £22
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £2.36m £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.22m £2.05m £2.55m £3.01m £3.23m
Expenditure - Raising funds £235.96k £329.42k £716.63k £1.26m £1.63m
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £34.63k £660.44k £0 £0 £0