Financial history MERTON HALL RECREATION CENTRE

Charity number: 1150528
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £14.47k £18.23k £14.33k £10.49k £2.90k
Total expenditure £10.55k £17.95k £12.28k £4.26k £6.71k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £10.00k N/A