Accounts and annual returns GLOBAL AID UK

Charity number: 1150787
Charity reporting is overdue by 114 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 114 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 114 days
Annual return 05 April 2022 13 March 2023 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 29 March 2022 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 05 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 11 May 2020 96 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required