Financial history GLOBAL AID UK

Charity number: 1150787
Charity reporting is overdue by 112 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £7.22k £7.69k £3.73k £2.26k £940
Total expenditure £6.57k £6.81k £3.51k £1.90k £765
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A