Accounts and annual returns MILL END COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1150227
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 21 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 04 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 24 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 04 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required