Financial history MILL END COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1150227
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £11.29k £14.41k £10.84k £13.25k £49.20k
Total expenditure £14.08k £9.52k £9.43k £11.88k £12.86k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A