Accounts and annual returns BURY ST EDMUNDS SKATE PARK EXPERIENCE
Charity number: 1153237

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 April 2023 | 69 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 October 2022 | 245 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 April 2021 | 63 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 04 April 2021 | 429 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 14 March 2019 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window