Financial history BURY ST EDMUNDS SKATE PARK EXPERIENCE

Charity number: 1153237
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £1.94k £2.19k £7.77k £988 £2.23k
Total expenditure £1.71k £2.11k £13.00k £0 £1.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A