ST LEONARDS BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1150270
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £53.13k £55.51k £93.50k £42.97k £44.12k
Total expenditure £47.81k £58.57k £98.78k £39.33k £42.18k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A