AHAVAS TORAH BOYS ACADEMY

Charity number: 1150729
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 15 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 15 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 30 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 30 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 28 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 28 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 02 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 02 May 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2015 17 March 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 17 March 2016 On time Download