Financial history THE RESTART PROJECT

Charity number: 1151286
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £244.27k £383.84k £501.05k £488.75k £287.82k
Total expenditure £231.43k £284.90k £405.09k £389.77k £405.61k
Income from government contracts £24.54k £4.35k £20.80k N/A £25.85k
Income from government grants £9.50k N/A £1.02k N/A £11.59k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £21.77k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £31.38k N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £447.90k N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £405.09k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A