Financial history OXFORD STUDENT CONFERENCES

Charity number: 1151631
Charity reporting is overdue by 413 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2015 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 14/03/2018 31/05/2019
Total gross income £39.91k £43.48k £43.48k £42.66k £45.21k
Total expenditure £43.74k £37.52k £37.03k £44.22k £40.04k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A