WIMBLEDON AND DISTRICT SYNAGOGUE

Charity number: 1150678
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Camilla McGill Trustee 02 December 2018 None on record
Julian Hunt Trustee 13 December 2020 None on record
Hilary Frances Leek Trustee 13 May 2020 None on record
Stella Ann Mason Trustee 22 November 2015 None on record
Yvonne Mason Trustee 13 December 2020 None on record
Anthony Ascher Salem Trustee 15 January 2020
HAMMERSMITH AND FULHAM CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAUX SERVICE Received: On time
LYSBETH FOX Trustee 13 December 2020
SAVE A VALUABLE ELEPHANT Received: On time
Ruth Bragman Trustee 02 December 2018 None on record
Wendy Vanessa Levy Trustee 02 December 2018 None on record
Susan Bennett Trustee 24 November 2019 None on record