Financial history COLLAGE ARTS

Charity number: 1153366
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £1.83m £1.95m £1.61m £1.45m £1.99m
Total expenditure £1.87m £2.01m £1.68m £1.62m £1.96m
Income from government contracts £0 £90.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £185.62k
Income - Donations and legacies £722.00k £0 £0 £466.01k £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £25.24k £0 £0 £63.43k
Income - Charitable activities £1.08m £794.42k £1.56m £0 £1.89m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £466.01k £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £35.00k £1.13m £42.43k £986.55k £34.90k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.87m £2.01m £1.68m £1.62m £1.96m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £5.00k £8.00k £6.00k £6.00k £6.48k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £1.62m £607.54k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0