KHALSA INTERNATIONAL WELFARE SOCIETY

Charity number: 1152436
Charity reporting is up to date (13 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021
Total gross income £38.53k £57.45k £68.84k £64.76k £76.72k
Total expenditure £34.43k £49.79k £70.86k £69.00k £76.01k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A