APEB (ASSOCIATION DES PARENTS DE L'ECOLE BILINGUE)

Charity number: 1152406
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 30 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 30 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 28 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 28 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 19 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 30 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 25 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 25 April 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2015 22 April 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2015 27 April 2016 On time Download