APEB (ASSOCIATION DES PARENTS DE L'ECOLE BILINGUE)

Charity number: 1152406
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2015 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019
Total gross income £25.73k £45.18k £34.75k £52.25k £63.64k
Total expenditure £32.35k £50.18k £28.75k £44.23k £53.67k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A