Financial history BABY JAMES' STARLIGHT TRUST

Charity number: 1151570
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2016 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020
Total gross income £465 £17 £17 £209 £0
Total expenditure £1.00k £1.80k £2.00k £2.50k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A