LONDON DISABILITY SWIMMING CLUB

Charity number: 1154351
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 26 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 27 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 04 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 21 March 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required