Financial history CHARITY IT LEADERS

Charity number: 1153226
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £110.97k £114.63k £127.51k £91.41k £108.95k
Total expenditure £143.12k £117.53k £147.45k £93.32k £122.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A