Trustees CHARITY IT LEADERS

Charity number: 1153226
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Matthew Paul Jago Chair 28 June 2016
None on record
Jonathan Andrew Curry Trustee 06 December 2022
None on record
Laura Kay Moore Trustee 06 December 2022
None on record
Neil Simon Edmonds Trustee 06 December 2022
None on record
Phillip Robert Edwards Trustee 08 October 2021
None on record
Anna Lynne Hoskins Trustee 15 October 2020
None on record
Syed Muhammad Ali Jaffri Trustee 15 October 2020
None on record
Nicholas Duncan Scott Napier Trustee 08 November 2019
None on record
Richard John Bailey Trustee 11 October 2019
None on record
LAURA JANE DAWSON Trustee 24 June 2013
None on record