AKO FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1151815
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 02 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 08 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 08 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 27 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 27 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 28 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 28 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 15 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 15 February 2017 On time Download