STREAM SKILLS ADVANCEMENT LTD

Charity number: 1152803
Charity reporting is overdue by 38 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 38 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 38 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 12 May 2021 193 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 20 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 06 March 2019 126 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 21 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required