Financial history INTERNATIONAL SPINAL RESEARCH TRUST

Charity number: 1151015
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.74m £1.81m £1.39m £1.75m £1.91m
Total expenditure £1.31m £1.53m £2.31m £1.62m £1.01m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.60m £1.76m £1.32m £1.71m £1.90m
Income - Other trading activities £5.00k £8.00k £5.00k £7.00k £6.00k
Income - Charitable activities £29.00k £20.00k £47.00k £21.00k £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £15.00k £17.00k £17.00k £12.00k £4.00k
Income - Other £85.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £103.00k £389.00k £88.00k £351 £206.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £791.00k £1.01m £1.74m £1.03m £549.00k
Expenditure - Raising funds £522.00k £516.00k £575.00k £591.00k £460.00k
Expenditure - Governance £33.00k £28.00k £34.00k £31.00k £29.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £366.00k £590.00k £1.32m £583.00k £260.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0