BOROUGH OF PUDSEY CHARITY

Charity number: 503570
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 31 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 14 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 29 April 2020 84 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 26 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 12 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required