BOROUGH OF PUDSEY CHARITY

Charity number: 503570
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £14.73k £15.52k £14.68k £16.03k £5.90k
Total expenditure £13.80k £15.61k £15.02k £16.11k £7.22k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A