Financial history NORTH TAMESIDE DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 503573
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £3.97k £4.50k £26.64k £19.86k £7.63k
Total expenditure £2.09k £7.40k £10.78k £34.56k £7.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A